Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 21 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2096 Week
» 27457 Month
» 260377 Year
» 1925753 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5640 m/e 10/1925

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 228
To Service During 10/1925
Withdrawal Thu 06/06/1963
Service Life 37 yrs, 8 mths , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1963 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1925
108   Rhymney 4w/e 03/11/1945
58   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 01/12/1945
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 8w/e 03/11/1951
88A   Radyr 4w/e 24/01/1959
82B   St Philips Marsh 4w/e 08/10/1960
84D   Leamington 4w/e 06/10/1962
     Withdrawn on 06/06/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RHY Rhymney 4w/e 03/11/1945
ALLOC CYS   4w/e 01/12/1945
ALLOC RYR Radyr 4w/e 28/12/1946
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 8w/e 03/11/1951
ALLOC 88A Radyr m/e 28/02/1959
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 05/10/1960
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 06/10/1962
WDN   w/e 20/07/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/12/1962 Western Regionboundary changes The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. SLS/196303

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1925 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5640
Built at Swindon Works
   
03/11/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Rhymney (108)    
01/12/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (58)    
03/11/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
24/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88A)    
08/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
06/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
06/06/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 5640    
12/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev