Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 473 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18276 Week
» 71292 Month
» 190819 Year
» 3217672 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5642 |
18/08/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31217 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
18/08/1960 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
13/11/1965 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
19/04/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 02/1978 |
|
Trip cock gear removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/08/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
19/04/1968 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/08/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5642 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 242 Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
13/11/1965 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
19/04/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31217 |
|
|
02/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Trip cock gear removed |
|
|
12/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
08/07/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31217 |
|
|
11/1999 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester (Marlowe Road) |
|
|