Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 756 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6156 Week
» 24208 Month
» 257128 Year
» 1922504 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5650 m/e 01/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 235
To Service During 01/1926
Withdrawal Mon 24/06/1963
Service Life 37 yrs, 5 mths , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1926
AYN   Abercynon 4w/e 28/01/1950
88A   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 04/10/1952
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 05/11/1955
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961
     Withdrawn on 24/06/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC THT Treherbert 4w/e 29/11/1947
ALLOC AYN Abercynon 4w/e 28/01/1950
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil m/e 30/11/1955
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961
WDN   4w/e 29/06/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1926 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5650
Built at Swindon Works
   
28/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (AYN)    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
05/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
28/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
24/06/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 5650    
05/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev