Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 189 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3221 Week
» 21273 Month
» 254193 Year
» 1919569 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5651 m/e 01/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 235
To Service During 01/1926
Withdrawal Sat 26/12/1964
Service Life 38 yrs, 11 mths , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1926
STB   Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 21/05/1949
84E   Tyseley 4w/e 05/10/1957
84G   Shrewsbury 4w/e 01/11/1958
84K   Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 27/12/1958
84J   Croes Newydd 4w/e 30/01/1960
88B   Radyr 4w/e 15/12/1962
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 01/06/1963
     Withdrawn on 26/12/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STB Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 21/05/1949
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 84K Wrexham Rhosddu m/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 84J Croes Newydd 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 88B Radyr 4w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 01/06/1963
WDN   5w/e 04/01/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/01/1960 Wrexham G.C. After closure on 4th January, 1610, 3749/60, 4683, 5606/51, 6610, 8734 an 9610 were transferred to Croes Newydd, whilst 40085/110/26/205 are stored at latter shed. 40086, 82000/31 went to Machynlleth. SLS/196003
10/04/1965 Locomotives Stored at Barry (In sidings at Barry Docks) In sidings at Barry Docks: 2859, 2873, 3612, 3845, 4253, 4270, 4561, 4566, 4588, 5193, 5227, 5521, 5526, 5532, 5538, 5539, 5541, 5542, 5552, 5553, 5557, 5558, 5570, 5572, 5651, 5794, 5814, 5952, 6023, 6024, 6115, 7229, 7722, 7903, 8419, 9462, 9468, 9629, 30541, 30830, 34016, 34027, 34028, 34058, 34067, 34070, 34072, 34073, 34081, 34092, 34105, 35006, 35009, 35018, 35025, 92207, 92245. Behind Barry Works: 2807, 2857, 2861, 2874, 2885, 3803, 3822, 4141, 4247, 4248, 4277, 4930, 4936, 4942, 4953, 4979, 4983, 5029, 5043, 5051, 5080, 5164, 5199, 5224, 5239, 5322, 5619, 5637, 5668, 5900, 5967, 5972, 6619, 6634, 6686, 6692, 6695, 6960, 6989, 7027, 7200, 7202, 7325, 9466, 30499, 30506, 30825, 30828, 30841, 30847, 31618, 31625, 31638, 31806, 31874, 45690, 48431, 53808, 53809. SLS/196505

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1926 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5651
Built at Swindon Works
   
21/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (STB)    
05/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
01/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
27/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (84K)    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (84J)    
15/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88B)    
01/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
26/12/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 5651    
05/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev