Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 243 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3275 Week
» 21327 Month
» 254247 Year
» 1919623 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5652 m/e 01/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 235
To Service During 01/1926
Withdrawal Thu 27/09/1962
Service Life 36 yrs, 8 mths , 27 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1926
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961
     Withdrawn on 27/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961
WDN   m/e 30/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1948 General Further locomotives noted carrying the prefix 'W' with blank tanks or tender sides were:-Nos. 33, 216/63, 393, 1141, 1993, 2048, 5388, 5625, 6703, 7751/68, while those lettered 'British Railways' were:-Nos. 361, 3103, 4217, 4533, 5035/99, 5257, 5520, 5641/52/55 an 6964. Nos. 271, 4206 an 5958 had been prefixed, but still carried 'G.W.R.' SLS/194805

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1926 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5652
Built at Swindon Works
   
28/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
27/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 5652    
11/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev