Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 166 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17969 Week
» 70985 Month
» 190512 Year
» 3217365 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5656 |
06/10/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31409 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
06/10/1960 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
07/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
04/12/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/12/1971 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/10/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
04/12/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
11/12/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
09/12/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/10/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5656 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 256 Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
25/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
23/02/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
14/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
15/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
07/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
10/08/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
03/04/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
04/12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
11/12/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
24/06/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31409 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
04/01/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31409 |
|
|
03/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|