Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 241 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3273 Week
» 21325 Month
» 254245 Year
» 1919621 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5660 m/e 02/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 235
To Service During 02/1926
Withdrawal Fri 23/10/1964
Service Life 38 yrs, 8 mths , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1926
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 17/06/1950
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 15/07/1950
88D   Merthyr Tydfil w/e 31/12/1950
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 31/01/1951
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/02/1951
88E   Abercynon 4w/e 03/10/1953
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 30/01/1954
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 30/01/1960
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961
88B   Radyr 6w/e 12/10/1964
     Withdrawn on 23/10/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 17/06/1950
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 15/07/1950
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil w/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 5w/e 30/01/1954
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961
ALLOC 88B Radyr w/e 12/10/1964
WDN   w/e 26/10/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/04/1948 Barry Works On 2/4 the following were observed in the Erecting Shop:-Nos. 344, 3707/14/75, 5608/19/60, 6669, 6754 an 9789, while out-side were:-Nos. 414, 1993, 5630, 6680, 6700 an 8748. SLS/194805

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1926 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5660
Built at Swindon Works
   
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
15/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
31/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
28/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
30/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
28/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
12/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88B)    
23/10/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 5660    
03/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev