Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 1026 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18829 Week
» 71845 Month
» 191372 Year
» 3218225 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5661 |
27/10/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31234 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
27/10/1960 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
20/12/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/10/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
03/10/1962 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/10/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5661 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 261 Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
24/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
20/12/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
09/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
10/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31234 |
|
|
23/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
20/07/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
26/07/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
11/06/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31234 |
|
|
05/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|