Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 806 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6206 Week
» 24258 Month
» 257178 Year
» 1922554 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5661 m/e 02/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 235
To Service During 02/1926
Withdrawal Fri 27/07/1962
Service Life 36 yrs, 5 mths , 26 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1962 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1926
58   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 01/12/1945
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 17/10/1950
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 31/10/1950
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 04/11/1950
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 30/11/1950
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 29/12/1951
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 31/01/1952
     Withdrawn on 27/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CYS   4w/e 01/12/1945
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 17/10/1950
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 04/11/1950
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 29/12/1951
WDN   m/e 31/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1926 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5661
Built at Swindon Works
   
01/12/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (58)    
17/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
31/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
31/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
27/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 5661    
09/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev