Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 483 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18286 Week
» 71302 Month
» 190829 Year
» 3217682 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5664 |
03/11/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31237 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
03/11/1960 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1966 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/11/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/11/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5664 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 264 Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
17/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
10/1966 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31237 |
|
|
23/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
16/06/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31237 |
|
|
09/2004 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|