Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 77 Today
» 1097 Yesterday
» 2346 Week
» 21247 Month
» 21247 Year
» 1686623 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5665 m/e 06/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 235
To Service During 06/1926
Withdrawal Wed 16/06/1965
Scrapping During 08/1965
Service Life 39 yrs , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1926
88C Barry 4w/e 31/08/1950
88F Treherbert 4w/e 08/10/1955
86G Pontypool Road 2w/e 07/03/1965
   Withdrawn on 16/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MTHR Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 07/08/1948
ALLOC BRY Barry on 14/10/1948
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 15/07/1950
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 12/08/1950
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 08/10/1955
TOSTORE   5w/e 16/05/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1926 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5665
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
07/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
16/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 5665    

prev prev