Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 823 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6223 Week
» 24275 Month
» 257195 Year
» 1922571 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5666 m/e 06/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 235
To Service During 06/1926
Withdrawal Tue 16/07/1963
Service Life 37 yrs, 1 mth , 15 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1963 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1926
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 21/04/1951
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 16/06/1951
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 6w/e 30/06/1951
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 8w/e 03/11/1951
MD     4w/e 23/02/1952
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 31/03/1952
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 19/04/1952
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 3w/e 17/05/1952
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 14/06/1952
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 6w/e 30/06/1952
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 12/07/1952
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961
     Withdrawn on 16/07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 21/04/1951
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 16/06/1951
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 8w/e 03/11/1951
ALLOC MD   4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 20/04/1957
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961
WDN   4w/e 27/07/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1926 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5666
Built at Swindon Works
   
21/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
16/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
30/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
03/11/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
23/02/1952 Allocation      
31/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
28/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
16/07/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 5666    
12/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev