Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 3238 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16644 Week
» 69660 Month
» 189187 Year
» 3216040 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5667 |
17/11/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31240 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
17/11/1960 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 06/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1966 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/11/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
29/12/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Train heating boiler burners |
Not known |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/11/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5667 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 267 Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
22/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
25/09/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
10/1966 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31240 |
|
|
09/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
20/07/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
26/07/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
17/01/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31240 |
|
|
03/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Birds: at Stratford MPD |
|
|