Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1693 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15099 Week
» 68115 Month
» 187642 Year
» 3214495 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5670 |
05/01/1961 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31242 |
26/01/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
05/01/1961 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
09/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
08/10/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/01/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
08/10/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
20/08/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/01/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5670 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 270 Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
09/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
10/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
05/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
09/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
08/10/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
26/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31242 |
|
|
14/12/1998 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31242 |
|
|
06/1999 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by English, Welsh & Scottish Railways: Wigan |
|
|