Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 204 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3236 Week
» 21288 Month
» 254208 Year
» 1919584 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5670 m/e 08/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 235
To Service During 08/1926
Withdrawal Mon 19/10/1964
Service Life 38 yrs, 2 mths , 18 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1926
CHYS   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 21/05/1949
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 17/05/1958
87B   Duffryn Yard 4w/e 26/12/1959
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/12/1963
     Withdrawn on 19/10/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC OXY Oxley 4w/e 14/06/1947
ALLOC CHYS Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 21/05/1949
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 17/05/1958
1STALLOC 87B Duffryn Yard 4w/e 26/12/1959
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 31/12/1963
WDN   w/e 19/10/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1926 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5670
Built at Swindon Works
   
21/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (CHYS)    
17/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
26/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B)    
28/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
19/10/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 5670    
12/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev