Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 723 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6123 Week
» 24175 Month
» 257095 Year
» 1922471 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5672 m/e 08/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 235
To Service During 08/1926
Withdrawal Fri 13/09/1963
Service Life 37 yrs, 1 mth , 13 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1926
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 17/10/1950
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 31/10/1950
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 14/07/1951
88D   Merthyr Tydfil m/e 31/07/1951
MD     4w/e 23/02/1952
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 31/03/1952
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 3w/e 17/05/1952
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 04/10/1952
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961
88B   Radyr 4w/e 15/12/1962
     Withdrawn on 13/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 17/10/1950
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 14/07/1951
ALLOC MD   4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961
ALLOC 88B Radyr 4w/e 15/12/1962
WDN   4w/e 29/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1926 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5672
Built at Swindon Works
   
17/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
31/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
14/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
31/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
23/02/1952 Allocation      
31/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
28/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
15/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88B)    
13/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 5672    
04/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev