Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 819 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6219 Week
» 24271 Month
» 257191 Year
» 1922567 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5674 m/e 08/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 235
To Service During 08/1926
Withdrawal Mon 20/04/1964
Service Life 37 yrs, 8 mths , 20 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1926
CVM     8w/e 23/03/1946
CVCH     4w/e 20/04/1946
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 30/01/1960
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961
88F   Treherbert 4w/e 04/11/1961
     Withdrawn on 20/04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MTHR Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 23/02/1946
ALLOC CH   4w/e 20/04/1946
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 04/11/1961
WDN   3w/e 04/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1926 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5674
Built at Swindon Works
   
23/03/1946 Allocation      
20/04/1946 Allocation      
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
28/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
04/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
20/04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 5674    
11/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev