Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 31 Online
» 4354 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 19966 Week
» 118611 Month
» 321275 Year
» 3348128 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5677 |
15/12/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31249 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
15/12/1960 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1964 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
09/05/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 02/1978 |
|
Trip cock gear removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/12/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
09/05/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/12/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5677 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 277 Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
03/1964 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
28/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
16/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Loaned to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
23/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
09/05/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
10/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
09/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
03/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
31/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
10/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31249 |
|
|
02/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Trip cock gear removed |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
16/12/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31249 |
|
|
05/1995 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|