Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 194 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3226 Week
» 21278 Month
» 254198 Year
» 1919574 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5677 m/e 09/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 235
To Service During 09/1926
Withdrawal w/e Sat 06/11/1965
Service Life 39 yrs, 2 mths , 6 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1966 at Cohens (Morriston)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1926
88A   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 27/02/1954
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 03/11/1956
87A   Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 06/10/1962
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 15/12/1962
88D   Rhymney w/e 08/11/1964
6C   Croes Newydd on 25/04/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 06/11/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 27/02/1954
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 03/11/1956
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 88D Rhymney 3w/e 02/11/1964
ALLOC 6C Croes Newydd 5w/e 12/04/1965
ALLOC 6C Croes Newydd 4w/e 08/05/1965
WDN   w/e 06/11/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1926 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5677
Built at Swindon Works
   
27/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
03/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
06/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
15/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
08/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Rhymney (88D)    
25/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C)    
06/11/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 5677    
05/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Morriston    

prev prev