Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 780 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14186 Week
» 67202 Month
» 186729 Year
» 3213582 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5680 |
22/12/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31252 |
02/02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
22/12/1960 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 11/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1965 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
28/08/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/12/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
28/08/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/12/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5680 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 281 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
12/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
15/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
06/1965 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
28/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
11/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31252 |
|
|
03/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
11/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
03/2000 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by EMR: at Peterborough LIP |
|
|
31/03/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31252 |
|
|