Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 78 Today
» 1097 Yesterday
» 2347 Week
» 21248 Month
» 21248 Year
» 1686624 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5687 m/e 01/1927

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 235
To Service During 01/1927
Withdrawal Mon 02/12/1963
Scrapping During 11/1964
Service Life 36 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1927
58 Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 03/11/1945
88B Cardiff East Dock 8w/e 20/04/1957
88A Radyr 4w/e 25/01/1958
88F Treherbert 4w/e 12/06/1958
88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 15/12/1962
   Withdrawn on 02/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CYS   4w/e 03/11/1945
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 20/04/1957
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 15/12/1962
WDN   4w/e 30/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1927 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5687
Built at Swindon Works
   
03/11/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (58)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
25/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88A)    
12/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
15/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
02/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 5687    

prev prev