Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 400 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18203 Week
» 71219 Month
» 190746 Year
» 3217599 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5688 |
m/e |
01/1927 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
56xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
235 |
To Service |
During 01/1927 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 03/06/1965 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 5 mths , 3 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1965 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1927 |
THT |
|
Treherbert |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
88E |
|
Abercynon |
4w/e |
04/05/1963 |
88D |
|
Rhymney |
w/e |
08/11/1964 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
03/06/1965 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
88E |
Abercynon |
4w/e |
04/05/1963 |
ALLOC |
88D |
Rhymney |
3w/e |
02/11/1964 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
5w/e |
12/04/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
03/06/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
4w/e |
13/06/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1927 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5688 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Treherbert (THT) |
|
|
04/05/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abercynon (88E) |
|
|
08/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rhymney (88D) |
|
|
03/06/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5688 |
|
|
10/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|