Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 4323 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17729 Week
» 70745 Month
» 190272 Year
» 3217125 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5689 |
02/03/1961 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31261 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
02/03/1961 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1966 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
02/12/1972 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
04/1976 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/03/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
02/12/1972 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC, EQ Brakes |
|
|
04/1976 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/03/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5689 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 290 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
08/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
12/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
22/02/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
03/1966 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
17/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
08/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
02/12/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31261 |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
04/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
09/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
05/01/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31261 |
|
|
11/1990 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by British Rail: at Stratford MPD |
|
|