Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 109 Today
» 5422 Yesterday
» 21143 Week
» 119788 Month
» 322452 Year
» 3349305 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5692 |
m/e |
01/1927 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
56xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
235 |
To Service |
During 01/1927 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 21/07/1965 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 6 mths , 20 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
88A |
Cardiff Cathays |
4w/e |
17/10/1950 |
ALLOC |
88F |
Treherbert |
4w/e |
12/07/1958 |
ALLOC |
88A |
Radyr |
m/e |
31/01/1959 |
ALLOC |
87F |
Llanelli |
4w/e |
05/10/1960 |
ALLOC |
88H |
Tondu |
4w/e |
27/07/1963 |
ALLOC |
88B |
Radyr |
3w/e |
04/05/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
25/07/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1927 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5692 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Rhymney (RHY) |
|
|
17/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) |
|
|
31/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) |
|
|
12/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Treherbert (88F) |
|
|
27/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88A) |
|
|
08/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
27/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tondu (88H) |
|
|
04/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88B) |
|
|
21/07/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5692 |
|
|
10/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|