Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 77 Today
» 1097 Yesterday
» 2346 Week
» 21247 Month
» 21247 Year
» 1686623 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5694 m/e 01/1927

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 235
To Service During 01/1927
Withdrawal Fri 13/11/1964
Scrapping During 02/1965
Service Life 37 yrs, 10 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1927
88F Treherbert m/e 16/06/1956
88B Radyr 6w/e 13/04/1964
   Withdrawn on 13/11/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 19/05/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/07/1961 Stafford Road Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: 1455, 2217, 3210, 3610, 3792, 4110/20, 4290, 4703, 4910/96, 5416, 5563/8/70, 5679, 5957, 6611/68, 7308/39, 7403, 8403, 9464, 9674, 9778. Weigh House : D3034, 1011. Works Yard: 1003/7, 2249, 3201, 3618, 4591, 5548, 5694, 5933, 6314, 6424, 6688, 7244, 73037. SLS/196108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1927 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5694
Built at Swindon Works
   
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
13/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88B)    
13/11/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 5694    

prev prev