Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 466 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18269 Week
» 71285 Month
» 190812 Year
» 3217665 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5695 |
20/04/1961 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31265 |
04/1974 |
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31430 |
24/11/1983 |
|
TOPS (31/5) |
31530 |
31/12/1989 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
20/04/1961 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
23/11/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
11/1971 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 04/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/04/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
11/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
by 04/1977 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/04/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5695 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 296 Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
13/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
23/11/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
11/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
04/12/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
11/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31265 |
|
|
04/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
07/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
24/11/1983 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31430 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
31/12/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31530 |
|
|