Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 641 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18444 Week
» 71460 Month
» 190987 Year
» 3217840 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5696 |
04/05/1961 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31266 |
12/01/1974 |
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31460 |
21/12/1984 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
04/05/1961 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
02/1978 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/05/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
02/1978 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/05/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5696 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 297 Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
15/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
11/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
23/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
08/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
12/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
12/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31266 |
|
|
02/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
11/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
01/11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
21/12/1984 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31460 |
|
|
01/12/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31460 |
|
|
01/2007 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|