Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 216 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3248 Week
» 21300 Month
» 254220 Year
» 1919596 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5696 m/e 01/1927

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 235
To Service During 01/1927
Withdrawal Fri 07/05/1965
Service Life 38 yrs, 4 mths , 6 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1927
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961
     Withdrawn on 07/05/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961
TOSTORE   5w/e 12/04/1965
WDN   5w/e 16/05/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1927 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5696
Built at Swindon Works
   
28/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
07/05/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 5696    
08/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev