11/05/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5697 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 298 Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
26/06/1965 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
29/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
10/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
11/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
1973 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 31267 but not taken up |
|
|
29/12/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
04/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
04/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31419 |
|
|
06/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
10/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
02/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
12/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
30/04/1990 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31519 |
|
|
01/12/1995 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31519 |
|
|
03/2001 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by English, Welsh & Scottish Railways: Wigan |
|
|