Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 3153 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16559 Week
» 69575 Month
» 189102 Year
» 3215955 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5710 |
m/e |
02/1929 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1929 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5710 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23828 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Didcot (DID) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
21/04/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) |
|
|
12/08/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5710 |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|