Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 4310 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17716 Week
» 70732 Month
» 190259 Year
» 3217112 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5718 |
11/07/1959 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
26/12/1959 |
R.9951 |
Vacuum Trip Gear |
|
£67/14/- |
|
£67/14/- |
03/12/1960 |
R.11936 |
Wrap round windscreens replaced with flat ones. |
|
£142/12/10 |
£31/7/2 |
£174/-/- |
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/07/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Derby Works |
|
n/a |
17/12/1959 |
18/12/1959 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
2 days |
|
|
|
Derby Works |
|
n/a |
16/02/1960 |
28/04/1960 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
73 days |
|
|
|
Derby Works |
|
n/a |
07/07/1960 |
17/10/1960 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
103 days |
|
|
|
Metropolitan Vickers |
|
n/a |
28/10/1961 |
27/11/1962 |
Heavy Casual |
|
|
|
396 days |
|
|
|
Performance Statistics (Form E.R.O 3666)
Year |
Annual Mileage |
Cumulative Mileage |
Fuel Oil Utilised |
Approximate Miles/Gallon |
Classified Wait Repair |
Classified Wait Works |
Classified On Works |
Classified Total (Wkdys) |
Running Repairs |
Running Repair & Exams Cost |
Wkdys Not Required for Service |
Wkdys Stored Serviceable |
Wkdys Stored Unserviceable |
Total Weekdays Unavailable |
1959 |
20,879 |
20,879 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1960 |
15,485 |
36,364 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1961 |
226 |
36,590 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1962 |
4,968 |
41,558 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1963 |
51,188 |
92,746 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/07/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5718 Built at Metropolitan Vickers Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
17/12/1959 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/12/1959. Dep: 18/12/1959. |
|
|
26/12/1959 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Trip Gear |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
16/02/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/02/1960. Dep: 28/04/1960. |
|
|
07/07/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/07/1960. Dep: 17/10/1960. |
|
|
06/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
03/12/1960 |
Modification |
Modification: Wrap round windscreens replaced with flat ones. |
|
|
28/10/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Metropolitan Vickers (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 28/10/1961. Dep: 27/11/1962. |
|
|
03/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12E) |
|
|
17/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
17/02/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
04/05/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5718 from Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
09/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston |
|
|