Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 829 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6229 Week
» 24281 Month
» 257201 Year
» 1922577 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5728 m/e 02/1929

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L853
Works Number 23846
To Service During 02/1929
Withdrawal Mon 07/05/1962
Service Life 33 yrs, 3 mths , 6 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1962 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1929
126   Pontypool Road 4w/e 01/12/1945
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 26/01/1957
87K   Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 22/02/1958
87B   Duffryn Yard 4w/e 05/09/1959
     Withdrawn on 07/05/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PPRD Pontypool Road 4w/e 01/12/1945
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 26/01/1957
ALLOC 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 22/02/1958
ALLOC 87B Duffryn Yard 4w/e 05/09/1959
WDN   m/e 31/05/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1949 Swindon Works New Work March: Nos. *7901 Dodington Hall (23/3), *7902 Eaton Mascot Hall (31/3); 9675 MTHR 4/3), 9676 CYS (10/3), 9677 CED (17/3). *Not allocated. Locomotives entering Works 28/2/49 to 30/3/49: Nos. 1002/09, 1086 (re-numbered 1147), 1213 (re-numbered 9), 1415, 1758 SDN (condemned), 1894 NPT (condemned), 2011/12, 2226/40/92/99, 2724 CYS (condemned), 69, 2806/36/71/82/83, 2902/15/31/81/87, 3032/33/43, 3175, 3386, 3562 OXF (condemned), 3616/45/55/88, 3719/44/47, 3819/29, 3901/55 (both for re-conversion), 4000/03/07/13/49, 4213/37/60/70, 4527/35/38/58/65/69/98, 4624, 4703, 4806/51 (both for re-conversion), 4936/55, 5020/33/55/57/75/89/91/95, 5166, 5310/30/41/72/96, 5509/66, 5719/28/98, 5931/79/88, 6017/24/25/28, 6132/53, 6341/53, 6720/47, 6803/22/54, 6900/02/07/33/46/55/62/64, 7202/09, 7302, 7415, 7766/84, 8753, 9311, 9600, 9704/08 and Class '8' W.D. 77234 (re-numbered 90201). Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include:-Nos. 1002/28, 2947, 4990, 6917/24, while Nos. 4007/20 are painted green and also lined. Works' pilots recently have been:-Nos. *212/13/46 and **1900. *Condemned 7/48. **Condemned 4/48.
No. 3150 has been fitted with the curved front end frames and cylinders (outside steam pipes) of No. 3184 (condemned in 1948). The original frames of No. 3150 had a square front end and the cylinders had internal steam pipes. No. 2123 has been fitted with auto gear.
SLS/194905

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1929 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5728
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23846
   
01/12/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (126)    
26/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
22/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K)    
05/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B)    
07/05/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 5728    
10/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev