Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 999 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2073 Week
» 27434 Month
» 260354 Year
» 1925730 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5791 m/e 09/1930

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 260
To Service During 09/1930
Withdrawal Thu 27/04/1961
Service Life 30 yrs, 7 mths , 27 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1930
84G   Shrewsbury 4w/e 13/07/1957
85D   Kidderminster 4w/e 31/10/1959
     Withdrawn on 27/04/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 85D Kidderminster 4w/e 31/10/1959
WDN   m/e 30/04/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/05/1961 Swindon Works (Dump) Gas Works: 4203, 5103/10/76, 9414. Stock Shed Yard: D817, D6319/21, 5815. Triangle: 1361/2/4, 1433, 1647, 3657/67/70/7, 3724, 5001, 6027, 6959, 8457, 8705, 9762. Works Yard: D804/38, D2144/88/91/6, D7000, 1029, 1501/2/9, 1604, 2516, 2884, 4090, 4950/72/8/85, 5022/97, 5949/58, 6004, 6937/62, 7007, 7221, 7304/40, 7761/75, 9400, 9749, 82031, 92226/45. Weigh House: D808, 4984. 'A' Shop: D602, D801/15/8/36/40/3/50/69/70, D1000-7, D2195/7-9, D2372-4, D3257, D6305/9, 3817, 4088, 4264/75, 4704, 4912/4/42/70/88/94, 5015/51/70/2/99, 5914/48/51/3/70/87, 6020, 6333/72, 6828/44/50, 6911/69/77/9, 7002/9/32/6, 7232/3, 13187, 13256/62, 15100/2, 82020/1, 92234. Dump: 1366, 1419/31/54/73, 2207/27, 3676, 5158/75/94, 5771/91, 6426, 7748, 8429, 8722/6/40/69/77, 9735/81. 'C' Shop: 5207, 8101. Field: 78001/8. SLS/196107

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1930 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5791
Built at Swindon Works
   
13/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
31/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D)    
27/04/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 5791    
07/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev