Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 841 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6241 Week
» 24293 Month
» 257213 Year
» 1922589 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5793 m/e 10/1930

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 260
To Service During 10/1930
Withdrawal Tue 24/04/1962
Service Life 31 yrs, 6 mths , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1930
MTHR   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 31/12/1949
88A   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 14/08/1954
87K   Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 22/02/1958
83B   Taunton 4w/e 05/09/1959
     Withdrawn on 24/04/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MTHR Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 31/12/1949
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 14/08/1954
ALLOC 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 22/02/1958
ALLOC 83B Taunton 4w/e 05/09/1959
WDN   m/e 30/04/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1930 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5793
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (MTHR)    
14/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
22/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K)    
05/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
24/04/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 5793    
09/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev