Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 2092 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19895 Week
» 72911 Month
» 192438 Year
» 3219291 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5800 |
01/06/1961 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31270 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
30 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
A1A-A1A |
Builder |
Brush Traction, Loughborough |
Works Number |
301 |
To Service |
01/06/1961 to March (31B) |
Withdrawn |
26/05/2000 |
Time in Service |
38 yrs, 11 mths , 25 dys |
Cut Up |
05/2000 |
Information |
4-digit route indicators |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
01/06/1961 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
07/1966 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1974 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 08/1976 |
|
Modified headcode box |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/06/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
0000 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
Freight working |
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/06/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5800 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 301 Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
07/1966 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
10/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
12/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31270 |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
08/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
05/2000 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
26/05/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31270 |
|
|