Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1231 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14637 Week
» 67653 Month
» 187180 Year
» 3214033 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5802 |
15/06/1961 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31272 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
15/06/1961 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1966 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
10/06/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/06/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
10/06/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
0000 |
Severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Light engine |
|
0000 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Freight working |
|
08/09/1962 |
Not severe |
|
Not known |
Not known |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/06/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5802 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 303 Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
24/08/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
10/1966 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
17/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
10/06/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
18/09/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
12/02/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31272 |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
15/08/1995 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31272 |
|
|
09/1995 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|