Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 485 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14528 Week
» 79482 Month
» 282146 Year
» 3308999 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5808 |
20/07/1961 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31278 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
20/07/1961 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
04/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
11/01/1977 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/07/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
11/01/1977 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/07/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5808 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 309 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
05/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41f) |
|
|
17/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
06/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
13/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
04/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
11/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
03/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31278 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
11/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
11/01/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1989 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|
29/03/1989 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31278 |
|
|