Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 32 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2107 Week
» 27468 Month
» 260388 Year
» 1925764 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5813 on 14/08/1933

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 58xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-4-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 279
To Service Sat 14/08/1933
Withdrawal Sat 30/11/1957
Service Life 24 yrs, 3 mths , 16 dys
Total Mileage 399,130

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 25/01/1958 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 14/08/1933
BRD   Bristol Bath Road 8w/e 23/03/1946
     Stored on 23/04/1956
84D   Leamington (Reinstated) on 05/04/1957
     Withdrawn on 30/11/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BRD Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 23/03/1946
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 20/04/1957
WDN   m/e 30/11/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1942 Sightings No. 5813 seen at RDG various dates early Jan.: Thought this was CARM! 5010 fresh out SDN on 8/1 appeared to be marked SLO, but probably GLO. SLS/194302

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
14/08/1933 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5813
Built at Swindon Works
   
23/03/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD)    
23/04/1956 To Store To Store    
05/04/1957 Reinstated Reinstated to Leamington (84D)    
30/11/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 5813    
25/01/1958 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev