Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 837 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14243 Week
» 67259 Month
» 186786 Year
» 3213639 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5830 |
11/01/1962 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31297 |
05/1974 |
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31463 |
11/02/1985 |
|
TOPS (31/5) |
31563 |
09/10/1990 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
11/01/1962 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
02/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
27/01/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/01/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
27/01/1977 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/01/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5830 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
18/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
12/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
03/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
10/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31297 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
27/01/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
11/02/1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31463 |
|
|
09/10/1990 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31563 |
|
|
01/02/1998 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31563 |
|
|