Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1589 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 25220 Week
» 90174 Month
» 292838 Year
» 3319691 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5836 |
12/04/1962 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31303 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31458 |
04/12/1984 |
|
TOPS (31/5) |
31558 |
30/04/1990 |
|
TOPS (31/4 (2)) |
31458 |
05/02/2001 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
12/04/1962 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
02/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
01/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/04/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
0000 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Not known |
Not Known |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/04/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5836 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
18/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
01/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
10/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31303 |
|
|
12/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
04/12/1984 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31458 |
|
|
30/04/1990 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31558 |
|
|
01/01/1996 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31558 |
|
|
05/02/2001 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31458 |
|
|
12/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Ron Hull Jr.: Rotherham |
|
|