Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 791 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14197 Week
» 67213 Month
» 186740 Year
» 3213593 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5841 |
17/05/1962 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31308 |
12/12/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
17/05/1962 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1965 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
11/1976 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
05/11/1976 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/05/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
11/1976 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
05/11/1976 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/05/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5841 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
03/1965 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
21/08/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
28/08/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
12/12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31308 |
|
|
19/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
06/07/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
11/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
05/11/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
12/2006 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Old Oak Common MPD |
|
|