Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 765 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14808 Week
» 79762 Month
» 282426 Year
» 3309279 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5842 |
24/05/1962 |
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31416 |
09/1973 |
|
TOPS (31/5) |
31516 |
08/11/1990 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
24/05/1962 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
16/06/1972 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
03/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
10/03/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
10/03/1973 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 04/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/05/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
16/06/1972 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC, EQ Brakes |
|
|
03/1973 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
WR ATC, EQ Brakes |
|
|
10/03/1973 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
WR ATC, EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 04/1977 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 12/1977 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/05/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5842 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
17/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Division (D15) |
|
|
01/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
12/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
20/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
06/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
12/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
16/06/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
10/03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
10/03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
10/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
09/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31416 |
|
|
04/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
09/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
08/11/1990 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31516 |
|
|
01/10/1995 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31516 |
|
|
10/2001 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Kingsbury |
|
|