Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 132 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3645 Week
» 23938 Month
» 201842 Year
» 1867218 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Vehicle 59088 01/10/1957

Vehicle Specifics
Class as Built 162
Vehicle Type TBA (TS(L))
To Service 01/10/1957
Withdrawn 29/09/1987 off Ayr (AY)
Time in Service 29 yrs, 11 mths , 28 dys
Status Awaiting Scrapping

Allocations
Code Name Date From
SGosfo (New) w/e 01/10/1957
   Withdrawn on 29/09/1987


Formations
Date Unit Formation Notes
15/06/1973 (snapshot)   50194 (MC(L)),  59088 (TS(L)),  59093 (TBS(L)),  50176 (MC(L))
06/07/1973 (snapshot)   50176 (MC(L)),  59093 (TBS(L)),  59088 (TS(L)),  50194 (MC(L))
01/02/1981 (snapshot) 312 51237 (MBS),  59088 (TS(L)),  50175 (MC(L))

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also

prev prev