Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 992 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2066 Week
» 27427 Month
» 260347 Year
» 1925723 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5966 on 20/03/1937

Names Carried
Date From Name
20/03/1937 ASHFORD HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 304
To Service Fri 20/03/1937
Withdrawal Fri 21/09/1962
Service Life 25 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 20/03/1937
84D   Leamington m/e 31/01/1951
84D   Leamington 4w/e 28/02/1951
84B   Oxley 4w/e 01/11/1952
81F   Oxford 4w/e 21/05/1955
     Withdrawn on 21/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84D Leamington m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 84B Oxley 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 21/05/1955
WDN   m/e 30/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1947 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during December included: Nos. 111, 823, 1007, 1017, 1760, 2280, 2830, 2873, 2902, 2940, 3810, 3856, 4013, 4036, 4062, 4702, 4705, 4854, 4946, 4947, 5024, 5072, 5073, 5092, 5939, 5966, 6310, 6312, 6329, 6350, 6374, 6397, 6866, 6901, 6921, 6938, 6948, 7001 and W.D. 77429. Works' pilots recently have been: Nos. 242, 905, 1713, 2781 an 3561. W.D. No. 73291 was ex Works on 11/12, having been fitted with G.W. top feed clacks and a Wakefield lubricator; the Westinghouse brake had been removed. No. 3215 has been fitted with a repaired R.O.D. tender and was ex Works on 12/12. SLS/194802
30/06/1949 Swindon Works (entering Works) New Work June: Nos. 7021 Haverfordwest Castle LDR (7/6), 7022 Hereford Castle CDF (14/6), 7023 Penrice Castle CDF (23/6), *7024 Powis Castle (30/6); *1500 (22/6), 41501 (1/7). *Not allocated. Nos. 7021-24 are painted dark green and lined, while Nos. 1500/1 are unlined black. No. 1500 has so far been tried on a variety of jobs, and it is possible that they all may go to Cardiff Docks. Locomotives entering Works during June included: Nos. 1001/29, 1335/63, 1458, 2216, 2534/72, 2823/81/82/84/92, 2945, 3031/34, 3161/67, 3649, 3851, 4016/37/40/83/84, 4259, 4381, 4504/13/93, 4651, 4807/54/56 (for reconversion to coal-burning), 4961, 5008/28/52/53/82, 5151, 5303/32/61, 5510/57/58, 5760/80/92, 5800, 5910/35/40/66, 6007/20, 6105/08, 6314/35/44/70/79, 6409, 6739, 6814/21/26/63/70, 6904/20/68, 7016, 7239, 7700/10/24/28/35, 7803, 7900, 8762/98 and E1066. Condemned: 53, 1731, 2651/55, 3364, 9072. No. 7900 came in for rebalancing, while No. E1066 had a hot box. No. 2848 has been reconverted to coal-burning. No. 6000 was ex Works on 17/6 painted in the new blue and lined, with crest on the tender, while No. 6011 has also appeared in the same livery, but, as yet, has no crest on the tender. Nos. 4052/58 are ex Works painted green and lined, while further locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 1017/29, 6931/43 an 6936 (with the crest on the tender). Stock Shed: Nos. 4914, 5919, 6997-99 and 7902-04 have now been taken out of store and put into traffic, Nos. 4914, 6997/99 and 7902 have gone to BRD, No. 6998 to CDF and Nos. 7903/04 to PDN. SLS/194908
31/08/1949 Swindon Works New Work August: Nos. 7025 Sudeley Castle PDN (2/8), 7026 Tenby Castle (15/8), 7027 Thornbury Castle LA (25/8); 1503 PDN (8/8), 1504 PDN (17/8), 1505 PDN (29/8). Nos. 7025-27 are painted dark green and lined, while Nos. 1503-05 are unlined black. Contractor built: Nos. 8400 TYS, 8401 CDF, 8402 (W.G.B. 2912/49) PILL (26/8), 8450 (Y.E. Co. 2443/49) NPT (17/8). Nos. 8400-02/50 are unlined black. Condemned: Nos. 289 (original T.V. R/T boiler and curved top tanks), 1884 (closed cab), 1930 (open cab), 2902, 3182 an 3419. No. 6320 has been re-converted to coal-burning. Locomotives entering Works during August included: Nos. 1000/04/25, 1427/37, 2117 (closed cab), 2211/12/14/21/67, 2462, 2815/52/75/87, 3016/20, 3174/86, 3635/77, 3715/99, 3805/14/43, 4013/15/33/47/80, 4107/48/49/55, 4269/78, 4502/10/59/65/82/92/95, 4637/50/79/97, 4906/51/81, 5001/18/30/42/57/76/80/94/99, 5206, 5344/45/80, 5501/05/22/37/54, 5749, 5804, 5904/12/21/27/44/45/47/66, 6000/04/19, 6105/07/43/61, 6338/77, 6408/31, 6741, 6808/19/28/29/44, 6905/65, 7219/36, 7310, 7414, 7718, 7815/16, 7904, 8789, 9638 an 90712. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 1005/12, 4901/23/50, 5912/18 an 6920. September: A batch of new Class '2' 2-6-2T's and Class '4' 2-6-0's is to be built here. They will be similar to existing L.M.S. designs, but will have modified G.W.R. boilers. The frames have already been cut for five of the 2-6-0's. SLS/194910
31/07/1962 Withdrawn GWR engines It is understood that the following have been withdrawn and are lying at their home sheds mainly: 1004/26, 1462, 2200/29/56/71/94, 3211, 3623/30/88/94, 3741/50/83, 4037/99, 4102/6/16/8/29/52, 4236/91, 4557/67, 4906/9/13/7/21/34/7/41/4/7/8/52/60/7/9/84/99, 5007/8/11/6/7/9/21/30/2/3/4/6/45/6/7/52/61/4/6/8/75/88/94, 5190, 5357/99, 5520/5/44/50/4/62, 5617/31/46/98, 5746, 5910/1/7/8/26/30/1/40/59/64/6/73/80/1/2/99, 6001/2/7/9/12/4/5/6/9/21/2/6/7, 6146, 6330/42/62/6/88/91, 6617/30/40/1/7, 7300/1/5/11/6/21/31/6/41, 8449, 9785, 42385, 90355/6/565/693. LTE has 7749 on loan pending permanent transfer. SLS/196210

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
20/03/1937 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5966, name: ASHFORD HALL
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
28/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Oxley (84B)    
21/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
21/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 5966    
12/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev