Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4282 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17688 Week
» 70704 Month
» 190231 Year
» 3217084 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6 |
12/11/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
44006 |
01/10/1973 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
WHERNSIDE |
12/11/1959 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
44 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Route Disc Indicators Nose end Gangway |
|
Cost when Built |
£129,371.00 |
To Service |
12/11/1959 to Camden (1B) |
Withdrawn |
25/01/1977 off Toton (TO) |
Time in Service |
17 yrs, 2 mths , 13 dys |
Cut Up |
02/1977 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Derby) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
12/11/1959 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
09/1973 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
15/11/1960 |
E.4983 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
£345/-/- |
|
£345/-/- |
23/03/1963 |
R.12286 |
SLM Exhausters
|
|
£14/10/- |
£4/-/- |
£18/10/- |
23/03/1963 |
C/RC/19 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
£196/10/- |
|
£196/10/- |
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/11/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
15/11/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
23/03/1963 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
20/05/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Derby Works |
04/07/1960 |
n/a |
|
08/07/1960 |
Non Classified |
|
1 day |
3 days |
4 days |
£3,202.00 |
12,076 |
|
Derby Works |
21/09/1960 |
75 days |
|
25/10/1960 |
Light Casual |
|
5 days |
24 days |
29 days |
£362.00 |
19,950 |
|
Crewe Works |
07/07/1961 |
255 days |
|
15/07/1961 |
Non Classified |
|
3 days |
4 days |
7 days |
£146.00 |
34,666 |
|
Derby Works |
25/09/1961 |
72 days |
|
20/10/1961 |
Light Casual |
|
4 days |
18 days |
22 days |
£946.00 |
53,194 |
|
Crewe Works |
01/02/1962 |
104 days |
|
13/03/1962 |
Heavy Casual |
|
1 day |
33 days |
34 days |
£2,974.00 |
80,282 |
|
Derby Works |
30/01/1963 |
323 days |
|
27/02/1963 |
Heavy Casual |
|
1 day |
23 days |
24 days |
£5,003.00 |
100,828 |
|
Derby Works |
03/05/1963 |
65 days |
|
27/05/1963 |
Heavy Casual |
|
|
99 days |
99 days |
|
107,028 |
|
Performance Statistics (Form E.R.O 3666)
Year |
Annual Mileage |
Cumulative Mileage |
Fuel Oil Utilised |
Approximate Miles/Gallon |
Classified Wait Repair |
Classified Wait Works |
Classified On Works |
Classified Total (Wkdys) |
Running Repairs |
Running Repair & Exams Cost |
Wkdys Not Required for Service |
Wkdys Stored Serviceable |
Wkdys Stored Unserviceable |
Total Weekdays Unavailable |
1959 |
1,712 |
1,712 |
2,400g |
0.71 |
|
|
|
|
37 |
£59 |
|
|
|
37 |
1960 |
22,034 |
23,746 |
25,954g |
0.85 |
|
6 |
27 |
33 |
118 |
£704 |
11 |
|
|
162 |
1961 |
46,087 |
69,833 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1962 |
26,955 |
96,788 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1963 |
19,945 |
116,733 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/11/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6, name: WHERNSIDE Built at Derby Works Allocated to Camden (1B) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
05/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Derby (17A) |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
21/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
08/07/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Derby Works (Non Classified) - Dep: 08/07/1960. Stopped on 04/07/1960 |
|
|
25/10/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 25/10/1960. Stopped on 21/09/1960 |
|
|
15/11/1960 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
15/07/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Dep: 15/07/1961. Stopped on 07/07/1961 |
|
|
20/10/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 20/10/1961. Stopped on 25/09/1961 |
|
|
03/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
13/03/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Casual) - Dep: 13/03/1962. Stopped on 01/02/1962 |
|
|
14/04/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
26/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
26/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
21/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
27/02/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Casual) - Dep: 27/02/1963. Stopped on 30/01/1963 |
|
|
23/03/1963 |
Modification |
Modification: SLM Exhausters
|
|
|
23/03/1963 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
27/05/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Casual) - Dep: 27/05/1963. Stopped on 03/05/1963 |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
09/1973 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
01/10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44006 |
|
|
25/01/1977 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44006 from Toton (TO) |
|
|
02/1977 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby |
|
|