|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 12/07/1950 | 16/08/1950 | 36 days | General | Named KENILWORTH |
||
Gateshead Works | 19/03/1951 | 20/03/1951 | 2 days | Light Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 24/09/1951 | 26/09/1951 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/11/1951 | 17/12/1951 | 34 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/12/1951 | 27/12/1951 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/01/1952 | 22/01/1952 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/07/1952 | 29/08/1952 | 36 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/07/1953 | 25/08/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29817 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/02/1955 | 23/03/1955 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 29850 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/07/1955 | 16/08/1955 | 27 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 18/11/1955 | 25/11/1955 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/09/1956 | 19/10/1956 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 10594 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/10/1956 | 30/10/1956 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/02/1957 | 23/02/1957 | 18 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/03/1957 | 30/03/1957 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/04/1958 | 16/05/1958 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29815 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/01/1959 | 12/02/1959 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/07/1959 | 12/08/1959 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29863 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/08/1959 | 22/08/1959 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/01/1961 | 01/03/1961 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 29851 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/04/1961 | 05/05/1961 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/08/1961 | 29/09/1961 | 32 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/02/1964 | 13/05/1964 | 91 days | General | Boiler number 29807 (Diagram 118) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/08/1965 | 20/08/1965 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 17/12/1965 | 01/01/1966 | 16 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/02/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Paint Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3063, D2385-9, E3056-61. New Erecting Shop Yard: E3062. Scrap Road: DEPT2, DEPT9, 61766, 64231, 68623, 68875, 68930/47/79, 69574. Stripping Road: D3452/85, 60010/23/92, 60118/36/40, 60529, 61950, 63943, 64878/85, 68943, 76032. Erecting Shop: D2233, D2402, D3165, D3575, D3630, D8210, 43081, 60030/1/68, 60103/10/29/39, 60521, 61138, 61254, 61313/8, 61807, 61901/13/61, 62032/50, 63926/86, 73001. Outside Erecting Shop: 60021/41, 61150, 61234, 61926, 63964, 73096. Crimpsall: 60133, 62039. Paint Shop: D318/33, D5686/7, D6708/9, D8046, 43152, 60514/34, 61096, 70054. Outside Paint Shop: 60124, 60522, 61165, 61954. Works Shunters: DEPT10 (ex-68911), DEPT11 (ex-68914), 68977. | SLS/196104 |
01/02/1964 | Branch line news (Works Yard) | Passenger services will be withdrawn from Hanley Loop (Etruria to Kidsgrove Liverpool Road) and Stoke to Silverdale branches from 2nd March, from the Aberdare-Abercynon and Cardiff Clarence Road branches from 16th March, from the Kemble to Cirencester, Kemble to Tetbury and Sheringham-Melton Constable branches from 6th April. The Waterside branch (from Old Dinting Goods GF, Mottram Yard) is to be closed completely on 2nd March. The Pinnox branch (Tunstall Junction to Longport Junction) was closed completely from 16th February, although the track is to be retained. From Pleasley Junction to 70 yards short of Messrs. Hollins coal siding (approx. 1 mile) is to be closed from 3rd March and the line thence to Pleasley East GF from 31st December, 1964. |
SLS/196403 |
07/03/1964 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D25, D26, D30, D170, D177, D179, D3140, D3244, D3677, D5371, D7587 painted, D7589 nearly complete, D7590 motors mounted, D7591 motors mounted, D7592 shell, D7593 shell, D7594 shell, d12113, 47482, 60146, 60822, 61032, 61319, 62060, 63458, 65789, 90272, 90345. Weigh House: D22, D5107, 62001. Stripping Shop: 43987, 90483. Works Yard: D2700, D5113, D5148, D7588 painted, 42165, 43144, 60124, 60802, 62065, 63460, 65033, 65099, 68046, 73071, 73097, 75006, 75056. Crossing: D11, D3378. Scrap Yard: 42407, 47589, 60874, 68039, 68061, 90624. | SLS/196403 |
25/04/1964 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D12, D25, D28, D181, D186, Dep. 84, D2078, D2605, D3140, D3455, D3656, D5106, D5155, D7591 painted, D7593 motors mounted, D7594, D7595 equipment fitted, D7596 body, 60124, 60133, 61016, 61256, 61289, 61388, 62065, 62067, 65882, 73004, 73071, 75056, 90047. Stripping Shop (Inside): 61306, 43033; Stripping Shop (Outside): 60011, 60864. Paint Shop (Inside): D182; Paint Shop (Outside): 75006 painted green. Level Crossing: D30, D3378 ex works, D3675, D7592 painted. Works Yard: D2700, D5166, D7597 body, 60973, 63399, 62057 frame, 65033, 65099, 73142 ex works, 90370 ex works. Works Shunter: 68037. Test House: Empty. North Road Scrap Yard: 63388, 65876. Shed (Waiting Works): 60020, 65880, 69020 Stored, 61304, 61321, 68046, 68051, 68054. | SLS/196406 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
23/03/1949 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 60124 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 2041 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
12/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1950. Dep: 16/08/1950. Work undertaken: Named KENILWORTH |
||
19/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/03/1951. Dep: 20/03/1951. | ||
24/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/09/1951. Dep: 26/09/1951. | ||
14/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 14/11/1951. Dep: 17/12/1951. | ||
17/12/1951 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
24/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/12/1951. Dep: 27/12/1951. | ||
08/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/01/1952. Dep: 22/01/1952. | ||
25/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/07/1952. Dep: 29/08/1952. | ||
27/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1953. Dep: 25/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29817 (Diagram 118) |
||
23/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1955. Dep: 23/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29850 (Diagram 118) |
||
21/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/07/1955. Dep: 16/08/1955. | ||
18/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/11/1955. Dep: 25/11/1955. | ||
20/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1956. Dep: 19/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10594 (Diagram 118) |
||
25/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/10/1956. Dep: 30/10/1956. | ||
06/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 06/02/1957. Dep: 23/02/1957. | ||
18/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/03/1957. Dep: 30/03/1957. | ||
15/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1958. Dep: 16/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29815 (Diagram 118) |
||
20/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/01/1959. Dep: 12/02/1959. | ||
09/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1959. Dep: 12/08/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29863 (Diagram 118) |
||
19/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/08/1959. Dep: 22/08/1959. | ||
11/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
17/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1961. Dep: 01/03/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29851 (Diagram 118) |
||
22/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/04/1961. Dep: 05/05/1961. | ||
29/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/08/1961. Dep: 29/09/1961. | ||
10/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
13/02/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1964. Dep: 13/05/1964. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29807 (Diagram 118) |
||
22/11/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
20/08/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 20/08/1965. Dep: 20/08/1965. | ||
17/12/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/12/1965. Dep: 01/01/1966. | ||
27/03/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60124 from Darlington (51A) |