|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 16/05/1949 | 01/06/1949 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 21/11/1949 | 21/12/1949 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/04/1950 | 09/06/1950 | 46 days | General | Named REDGAUNTLET |
||
Gateshead Works | 20/04/1951 | 24/04/1951 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/05/1951 | 12/07/1951 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 29843 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/11/1951 | 04/12/1951 | 21 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/05/1952 | 15/05/1952 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 02/12/1952 | 11/12/1952 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/02/1953 | 06/03/1953 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 29851 (Diagram 118) |
||
Gateshead Works | 07/01/1954 | 12/01/1954 | 6 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/05/1954 | 02/07/1954 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 10597 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/07/1954 | 09/07/1954 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/09/1955 | 01/11/1955 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 29811 (Diagram 118) |
||
Gateshead Works | 28/08/1956 | 03/09/1956 | 7 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/12/1956 | 15/12/1956 | 6 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/03/1957 | 26/04/1957 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29817 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/05/1958 | 30/05/1958 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/11/1958 | 01/01/1959 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 29877 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/07/1960 | 26/08/1960 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 10599 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/04/1961 | 31/05/1961 | 33 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/06/1950 | Recently named engines | Engines recently named include 60121 Silurian, 60131 Osprey, 60137 Redgauntlet, 60139 Sea Eagle. | SLS/195008 |
04/01/1959 | Doncaster MPD (Ex Wks.) | On shed, waiting Works-60101 (64B), 60506 (34E), 60118 (56C), 60078 (52A), 61159 (40B). Ex Wks.-60517 (52B), 60137 (52A), 61978 (34E), 70000 (30A), 61894 (40A), 61956 (40B), 60094 (64B), 61212 (36E). Stored-63939/41/2/3/54/6/7/63/4/7/9/77/81/3/4, 64876/981 all in open. Others-60031 (64B), D3646/7 (36C), 92035 (36C), D3621/2, D3481/2, 92172/3/95/2201, 69586 (34C), 48269 (2E), 62017/55/70 (31B), 43060 (40F). | SLS/195902 |
28/05/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Weigh House) | New Erecting Shop: D2392-4, D3489, E3062-7. Boiler Shop: E3068-70. Stripping Road: D2402, 60007/73, 60119/61, 61327, 61844/93, 61904/85/97, 62059, 63967, 70023. Scrap Road: 63947/58, 64970, 68916/29, 69561 all intact, with 63952 just cut up. Crimpsall: 70027, 73016. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60065. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D3129/52, D3445, D5534/71, 12124, 13252, 13325, 43088, 43152/5, 60013/24/33/88/99, 60525, 61095, 61190, 61249, 61300/70, 61832, 62051, 63963, 70001/5/35. Outside Erecting Shops: 60017, 61845. Outside Weigh House: 43091, 60137, 62047. Paint Shop: D2390/1, D5698, D6715, D8215, D9004/5, E3056/61, 60038/9, 61122/88, 63938, 76031. Outside Paint Shop: D345/6. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196107 |
10/03/1963 | Goole MPD (Stored in Works Yards) | Stored at Goole on 10th March-60518. | SLS/196304 |
23/04/1963 | Doncaster Works (Stored in Works Yards) | New Erecting Shop: E3090-5 no bogies, D5583, D5819, D6744. Works, Shunters : 68928/71/6. Awaiting Works: D203, D2010, D2561, D5510/95, D5602/57, D6707, D8240. Stored in Works Yards : 15004, 60014/39/49/54/76/137/500/17/26/39, 61135, 68925, 69523, 90250/3/70. Crimpsall: 60057/117/21/34/52, 62027/50, 90572/3, Dept. 10, D2008/27, D2567, D2957, D3625/45/63, D5045/70, D5523/42/84/5/609/54, D6709/804, D8205, D8401/9, D9008/19. Stripping Shop: 90043/109/33/602, D5655, D5804. Works Yard: 61348 in steam. Weigh House: 90024/569, D5822. Paint Shop: LNER 4771, 62024, 90036, D1517, D3685, D5050/5/94, D6834/5/6, E3083. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/12/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 60137 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2056 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
16/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/05/1949. Dep: 01/06/1949. | ||
21/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/11/1949. Dep: 21/12/1949. | ||
25/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1950. Dep: 09/06/1950. Work undertaken: Named REDGAUNTLET |
||
09/06/1950 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
20/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/04/1951. Dep: 24/04/1951. | ||
22/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1951. Dep: 12/07/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29843 (Diagram 118) |
||
14/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/11/1951. Dep: 04/12/1951. | ||
12/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/05/1952. Dep: 15/05/1952. | ||
02/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/12/1952. Dep: 11/12/1952. | ||
09/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1953. Dep: 06/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29851 (Diagram 118) |
||
06/03/1953 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
07/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/01/1954. Dep: 12/01/1954. | ||
11/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1954. Dep: 02/07/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10597 (Diagram 118) |
||
06/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/07/1954. Dep: 09/07/1954. | ||
21/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1955. Dep: 01/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29811 (Diagram 118) |
||
28/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/08/1956. Dep: 03/09/1956. | ||
10/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/12/1956. Dep: 15/12/1956. | ||
21/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1957. Dep: 26/04/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29817 (Diagram 118) |
||
01/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/05/1958. Dep: 30/05/1958. | ||
11/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1958. Dep: 01/01/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29877 (Diagram 118) |
||
15/05/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
23/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1960. Dep: 26/08/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10599 (Diagram 118) |
||
29/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/04/1961. Dep: 31/05/1961. | ||
09/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
29/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60137 from Tweedmouth (52D) |