|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 30/01/1950 | 03/02/1950 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/04/1950 | 20/04/1950 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/06/1950 | 21/08/1950 | 68 days | Heavy Casual | After derailment Named FLAMBOYANT |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/04/1951 | 11/04/1951 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/07/1951 | 13/07/1951 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/09/1951 | 21/09/1951 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/10/1951 | 04/12/1951 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/07/1952 | 01/08/1952 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/09/1952 | 29/09/1952 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/12/1952 | 24/12/1952 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/07/1953 | 18/08/1953 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/08/1954 | 03/09/1954 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/04/1955 | 25/05/1955 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 29787 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/07/1956 | 03/07/1956 | 1 day | Special | Axle test |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/03/1957 | 24/04/1957 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29800 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/12/1957 | 12/12/1957 | 4 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/09/1958 | 16/09/1958 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/11/1958 | 21/11/1958 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/03/1960 | 08/04/1960 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29834 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/02/1962 | 14/03/1962 | 24 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1950 | General | Two N.E. Region engines recently named are 60127 Wilson Worsdell and 60153 Flamboyant of Heaton and York respectively. Owing to the scarcity of pull-and-push engines at King's Cross, the Alexandra Palace branch has been worked occasionally by 'N.2' tanks, Which run round the train. One of these, numbered 69540 on the bunker, had the former number 9540 visible on the tanks. A fitted 'N.7' from Neasden has also been assisting, as only one of the 'F.2' 2-4-2T (E.7111) now remains and is in poor shape. This engine, originally M.S. & L. No. 783, built by Beyer Peacock in 1896 (No. 3701), class '9G,' is the sole survivor of the G.C. 2-4-2T which once totalled 37 engines. | SLS/195010 |
31/01/1951 | A1 Names | 'Al' names lately affixed include: 60150 Willbrook; 60151 Midlothian (new cast chimney); 60153 Flamboyant; 60155 Borderer; 60158 Aberdonian. | SLS/195105 |
26/02/1962 | Doncaster Works (Works Yard) | Works Yard: 43158, 60039/67, 60153, 60517, 60905/28, 61000/58, 61234, 62014, 63942. Stripping Shop: 60108, 60500, 63932. Outside Stripping Shop: 60040, 60162, 60850/75, 62034, 63652, 70036, 73016. Erecting Shop: D3129, D3440/80/2, D5655/63, D6707/9/15, D8210, 43080, 60030/2/51, 60129/39, 60871, 61281, 63630, 63872, 63945/84, 70038, 73036. Outside Erecting Shop: D5525, D5605/43/70, 60028. Weigh House: 60026, 60119. Scrap Road: 61818, 61945/66, 64177/91, 64245. Paint Shop: D380, D2408, D5376, E3071/2, 12126, 60078, 60870, 61315, 63571. New Erecting Shop: D6700, D8027, E3073-8. Boiler Shop: E3079/80. Works Shunters: DEPT.10/1, 63858, 68928. Ex-Works: 61285. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
26/08/1949 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 60153 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 2047 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Livery applied: BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
30/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/01/1950. Dep: 03/02/1950. | ||
12/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/04/1950. Dep: 20/04/1950. | ||
15/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 15/06/1950. Dep: 21/08/1950. Work undertaken: After derailment Named FLAMBOYANT |
||
11/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 11/04/1951. Dep: 11/04/1951. | ||
03/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/07/1951. Dep: 13/07/1951. | ||
03/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/09/1951. Dep: 21/09/1951. | ||
25/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1951. Dep: 04/12/1951. | ||
24/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/07/1952. Dep: 01/08/1952. | ||
29/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 29/09/1952. Dep: 29/09/1952. | ||
17/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/12/1952. Dep: 24/12/1952. | ||
09/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1953. Dep: 18/08/1953. | ||
24/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/08/1954. Dep: 03/09/1954. | ||
14/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1955. Dep: 25/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29787 (Diagram 117) |
||
03/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Special) - Arr: 03/07/1956. Dep: 03/07/1956. Work undertaken: Axle test |
||
18/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1957. Dep: 24/04/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29800 (Diagram 118) |
||
09/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/12/1957. Dep: 12/12/1957. | ||
16/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 16/09/1958. Dep: 16/09/1958. | ||
10/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/11/1958. Dep: 21/11/1958. | ||
01/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1960. Dep: 08/04/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29834 (Diagram 118) |
||
19/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/02/1962. Dep: 14/03/1962. | ||
02/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60153 from York (North) (50A) |