|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 12/04/1935 | 15/05/1935 | 34 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 19/08/1935 | 01/09/1935 | 14 days | Unclassified | Lifted for left trailing hot box |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/01/1936 | 06/03/1936 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/02/1937 | 03/04/1937 | 43 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 08/04/1937 | 15/04/1937 | 8 days | Unclassified | Left Leading bearing hot |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/03/1938 | 08/04/1938 | 37 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/11/1938 | 14/11/1938 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/05/1939 | 13/06/1939 | 40 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/11/1940 | 04/01/1941 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 9124 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/02/1942 | 29/07/1942 | 173 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/10/1942 | 16/10/1942 | 7 days | Light Repair | Fitted with indicator box |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/02/1944 | 18/03/1944 | 40 days | General | Tender number 5227 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/05/1945 | 23/06/1945 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/03/1947 | 12/04/1947 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 9568 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/06/1947 | 18/06/1947 | 12 days | Light Repair | Collision at Peterborough |
||
Darlington Works | 15/10/1947 | 15/10/1947 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/05/1948 | 23/07/1948 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 27031 (Diagram 94A) Painted Experimental Blue/Purple with Red and Cream lining Renumbered to BR 60036 |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/06/1949 | 22/07/1949 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 27021 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/11/1950 | 20/12/1950 | 34 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/11/1951 | 18/12/1951 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 27064 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/11/1952 | 09/12/1952 | 14 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/01/1953 | 14/02/1953 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/07/1953 | 25/08/1953 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 27059 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/04/1954 | 29/04/1954 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/1954 | 08/12/1954 | General | Boiler number 27039 (Diagram 94A) |
|||
Doncaster Works | 18/02/1956 | 06/04/1956 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 27078 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/09/1957 | 09/11/1957 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 27057 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/07/1958 | 23/07/1958 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/08/1958 | 14/11/1958 | 78 days | General | York buffer stop collision Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/03/1959 | 04/03/1959 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/06/1959 | 19/06/1959 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/09/1959 | 17/09/1959 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/05/1960 | 29/06/1960 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 29328 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/05/1962 | 19/07/1962 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 29308 (Diagram 107) Trough deflectors fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
26/06/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives in Works on 26/6 included; Nos. 1, 29, 30/6/9, 65/7, 104, 518, 818/83, 1083, 1128, 1800/24, 2821, 60042/49/97, 60515, 60870, 61830. The first of the new 'A.1' 4-6-2's No. 60114, was nearing completion here in early July and was being proceeded with faster than No. 60539. | SLS/194808 |
31/07/1962 | A3 trough-pattern smoke deflectors | The number of Class A3 Pacifics fitted with trough-pattern smoke deflectors is forty-three. A further six locos have since been modified at Doncaster Works and includes an additional example, not previously recorded, bringing the total equipped at the time of writing to exactly fifty. 60036 Colombo 7/62, 60066 Merry Hampton 10/61, 60037 Hyperion 5/62, 60075 St. Frusquin 4/62, 60051 Blink Bonny 3/62, 60111 Enterprise 4/62. 60054 Prince of Wales 5/62. | SLS/196210 |
10/03/1963 | Ardsley MPD (Stored) | Stored at Ardsley on 10th March-60036/69/70/7/80/92/125, 61068/310, 64719/49/54/6/60/96/859/79/86/911/8/69, 67742/63/5/6/77. | SLS/196304 |
01/04/1963 | Washingborough Junction (Stored) | The Washingborough Junc.- Pelham St. Junc, section of the Boston-Lincoln line has been taken out of use; trains now use the former avoiding line from Washingborough Junc. (s.b. now closed) to Greetwell Junc. and the GN/GE Joint line thence to Lincoln Central. | SLS/196304 |
19/09/1964 | Darlington MPD (Shed) | On shed-diesel bays: D5170/2, dead line: 69020, 90444/9; Roundhouse: D3228, D2706/31/2, D2318/36/40, D3229, DEPT87, 68011/37/43/7/50/3/60. Shed: 60024 ex works, 60036/45/808/84/5, 62001, 62002 ex works, 62003/43/4/8/64; 61030, 62368, 68010/4/46,151/4, 90011/4/98, 90361/556 ex works, 90688, 42405/77, 43050/6/7, 43102/29/40 and 63460 awaiting move to Stratford. | SLS/196410 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/06/1934 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Non-Corridor number 5568 | ||
09/07/1934 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2501, name: COLOMBO Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1791 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 94A boiler fitted |
||
12/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1935. Dep: 15/05/1935. | ||
19/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/08/1935. Dep: 01/09/1935. Work undertaken: Lifted for left trailing hot box |
||
31/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1936. Dep: 06/03/1936. | ||
20/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1937. Dep: 03/04/1937. | ||
08/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/04/1937. Dep: 15/04/1937. Work undertaken: Left Leading bearing hot |
||
03/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1938. Dep: 08/04/1938. | ||
10/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/11/1938. Dep: 14/11/1938. | ||
05/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1939. Dep: 13/06/1939. | ||
09/12/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
25/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1940. Dep: 04/01/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9124 (Diagram 94A) |
||
07/02/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1942. Dep: 29/07/1942. | ||
10/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/10/1942. Dep: 16/10/1942. Work undertaken: Fitted with indicator box |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
08/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1944. Dep: 18/03/1944. Work undertaken: Tender number 5227 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
05/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1945. Dep: 23/06/1945. | ||
03/11/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 571 but not taken up | ||
01/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 36 | ||
01/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1947. Dep: 12/04/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9568 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
07/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/06/1947. Dep: 18/06/1947. Work undertaken: Collision at Peterborough |
||
01/08/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
09/09/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
15/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/10/1947. Dep: 15/10/1947. | ||
29/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1948. Dep: 23/07/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27031 (Diagram 94A) Painted Experimental Blue/Purple with Red and Cream lining Renumbered to BR 60036 |
||
23/07/1948 | Livery | Change of livery to Experimental Blue/Purple with Red and Cream lining | ||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
08/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1949. Dep: 22/07/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27021 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
22/07/1949 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
17/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1950. Dep: 20/12/1950. | ||
09/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1951. Dep: 18/12/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27064 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
26/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1952. Dep: 09/12/1952. | ||
29/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/01/1953. Dep: 14/02/1953. | ||
21/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1953. Dep: 25/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27059 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
13/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/04/1954. Dep: 29/04/1954. | ||
11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/11/1954. Dep: 08/12/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27039 (Diagram 94A) |
||
18/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1956. Dep: 06/04/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27078 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
30/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1957. Dep: 09/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27057 (Diagram 94A) |
||
12/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/07/1958. Dep: 23/07/1958. | ||
29/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1958. Dep: 14/11/1958. Work undertaken: York buffer stop collision Double Chimney fitted |
||
02/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/03/1959. Dep: 04/03/1959. | ||
11/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/06/1959. Dep: 19/06/1959. | ||
11/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/09/1959. Dep: 17/09/1959. | ||
09/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1960. Dep: 29/06/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29328 (Diagram 107) |
||
11/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C) | ||
10/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
24/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1962. Dep: 19/07/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29308 (Diagram 107) Trough deflectors fitted |
||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
15/12/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
23/11/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60036 from Darlington (51A) | ||
01/1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped |