|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 02/06/1917 | 15/09/1917 | 106 days | General | Boiler number 1420 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/05/1922 | 05/08/1922 | 71 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 21/06/1924 | 18/10/1924 | 120 days | General | Boiler number 1421 (Diagram 18) Side Window Cab Fitted Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5165 |
||
Gorton Works | 17/04/1926 | 24/07/1926 | 99 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 31/07/1926 | 31/07/1926 | 1 day | Light Repair | Converted to oil burnng |
||
Nine Elms Works | 02/03/1927 | 02/03/1927 | 1 day | Unclassified | Oil burning equipment removed |
||
Gorton Works | 08/12/1928 | 09/02/1929 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 28/02/1931 | 04/04/1931 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 20/08/1932 | 24/09/1932 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 343 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/02/1934 | 17/03/1934 | 43 days | General | Eureka lubricator fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 07/03/1936 | 28/03/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 390 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/10/1937 | 20/11/1937 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 444 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/01/1940 | 02/03/1940 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 718 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/11/1941 | 06/12/1941 | 23 days | Heavy | Special examination |
||
Gorton Works | 15/04/1943 | 29/05/1943 | 45 days | Heavy | Boiler number 964 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/06/1944 | 30/09/1944 | 99 days | General | New frames & cylinders |
||
Gorton Works | 22/06/1946 | 03/08/1946 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 845 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/03/1947 | 05/04/1947 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 27/09/1947 | 18/10/1947 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 672 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/01/1949 | 05/03/1949 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3848 (Diagram 18) WPU Gear removed Renumbered to BR 69800 |
||
Darlington Works | 01/05/1951 | 08/06/1951 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 22377 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/04/1954 | 12/06/1954 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 22039 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/06/1954 | 16/06/1954 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/09/1956 | 16/10/1956 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 22397 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/03/1957 | 29/04/1957 | 41 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 22/08/1959 | 22/08/1959 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1957 | Leicester (G.C.) MPD | This shed is expected to close and the work shared between Neasden and Darnall (41A). At start of winter time tables the A3's (60049/102/4/6/7/11) were exchanged for V2's 60831/42/54/63/911. This leaves no A3's on the G.C. at all. A5 69800 has replaced L1 67786. | SLS/195711 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
18/03/1911 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 165 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Annesley (ANN) Diagram 18 boiler fitted |
||
02/06/1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1917. Dep: 15/09/1917. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1420 (Diagram 18) |
||
27/05/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1922. Dep: 05/08/1922. | ||
05/01/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
21/04/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
21/06/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1924. Dep: 18/10/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1421 (Diagram 18) Side Window Cab Fitted Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5165 |
||
17/04/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1926. Dep: 24/07/1926. | ||
31/07/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/07/1926. Dep: 31/07/1926. Work undertaken: Converted to oil burnng |
||
02/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Nine Elms Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/03/1927. Dep: 02/03/1927. Work undertaken: Oil burning equipment removed |
||
08/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1928. Dep: 09/02/1929. | ||
28/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1931. Dep: 04/04/1931. | ||
20/08/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1932. Dep: 24/09/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 343 (Diagram 18) |
||
03/02/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1934. Dep: 17/03/1934. Work undertaken: Eureka lubricator fitted |
||
07/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1936. Dep: 28/03/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 390 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
30/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1937. Dep: 20/11/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 444 (Diagram 18) |
||
04/10/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
17/08/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
27/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1940. Dep: 02/03/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 718 (Diagram 18) |
||
08/11/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
27/10/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
14/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 14/11/1941. Dep: 06/12/1941. Work undertaken: Special examination |
||
15/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 15/04/1943. Dep: 29/05/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 964 (Diagram 18) |
||
30/05/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
24/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1944. Dep: 30/09/1944. Work undertaken: New frames & cylinders |
||
24/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9800 | ||
22/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1946. Dep: 03/08/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 845 (Diagram 18) |
||
29/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/03/1947. Dep: 05/04/1947. | ||
27/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1947. Dep: 18/10/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 672 (Diagram 18) |
||
29/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1949. Dep: 05/03/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3848 (Diagram 18) WPU Gear removed Renumbered to BR 69800 |
||
26/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
01/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1951. Dep: 08/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22377 (Diagram 18) |
||
24/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1954. Dep: 12/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22039 (Diagram 18) |
||
10/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/06/1954. Dep: 16/06/1954. | ||
23/10/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
13/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1956. Dep: 16/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22397 (Diagram 18) |
||
20/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 20/03/1957. Dep: 29/04/1957. | ||
15/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
26/01/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) | ||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (16D) | ||
15/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E) | ||
11/01/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
22/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 22/08/1959. Dep: 22/08/1959. | ||
24/08/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69800 from Colwick (40E) | ||
11/1959 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |